NY S04070 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the commissioner of education to make recommendations to the board of regents relating to instruction on preventing child sexual exploitation and child abuse in grades kindergarten through eight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the commissioner of education to make recommendations to the board of regents relating to instruction on preventing child sexual exploitation and child abuse in grades kindergarten through eight.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.542
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a2577b
2019-06-03Assemblyreferred to education
2019-06-03SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-03SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1137
2019-06-03SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-28SenatePRINT NUMBER 4070B
2019-05-28SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2019-03-14SenatePRINT NUMBER 4070A
2019-03-14SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2019-02-27SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A02577 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s4070b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04070&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04070&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04070
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04070&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04070A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04070&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04070B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4070#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4070#SC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04070&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback