NY S04076 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes criminal liability for the failure to obtain medical care for a person in custody displaying medical distress.
Title
Imposes criminal liability for the failure to obtain medical care for a person in custody displaying medical distress.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-09-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4076B |
2019-09-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-04-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4076A |
2019-04-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03056 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes