NY S04078 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.691
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.691
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the insurance coverage of the synchronization of multiple prescriptions.
Title
Provides for the insurance coverage of the synchronization of multiple prescriptions.
Sponsors
Sen. Neil Breslin [D] | Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. Simcha Felder [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.691 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.987 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4078 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.108 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | rules report cal.108 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-28 | Senate | referred to insurance |
2019-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3009 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.987 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03009 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.691