NY S04079 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a pension benefit parity payment to certain retirees from a state management/confidential position.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides a pension benefit parity payment to certain retirees from a state management/confidential position.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1246
2019-06-11SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-03-05SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-02-27SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A02462 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - referred to governmental employees

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback