NY S04084 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that records of eviction proceeding shall be sealed when the leased property was foreclosed upon; prohibits use and disclosure of any such information relating to a tenant; imposes fine of between $1,000 and $2,000 for violations thereof.
Title
Provides that records of eviction proceeding shall be sealed when the leased property was foreclosed upon; prohibits use and disclosure of any such information relating to a tenant; imposes fine of between $1,000 and $2,000 for violations thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1096 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4084A |
2019-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2019-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05206 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to judiciary