NY S04088 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain corporations to permit shareholders to attend meetings via remote communication and to be deemed present for voting purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain corporations to permit shareholders to attend meetings via remote communication and to be deemed present for voting purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A434
2019-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.557
2019-02-27SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A00434 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback