NY S04118 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.217
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.217
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public utility companies to repair or replace all damaged residential lateral sewer and water pipes where such damage was caused by such public utility company.
Title
Requires public utility companies to repair or replace all damaged residential lateral sewer and water pipes where such damage was caused by such public utility company.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.217 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.516 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a5254c |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4118C |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.861 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4118B |
2019-04-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-04-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4118A |
2019-04-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CITIES |
2019-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A05254 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.217