NY S04119 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - signed chap.358
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - signed chap.358
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits emergency service providers from selling patient health information without written consent.
Title
Prohibits emergency service providers from selling patient health information without written consent.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-07 | Senate | signed chap.358 |
2019-10-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1306 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4119 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-05-29 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.369 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-15 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-09 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A230 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1306 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00230 (Same As) 2019-10-07 - signed chap.358