NY S04129 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - referred to social services
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of temporary disability and assistance to conduct a homelessness study; requires a report by June 30, 2017.
Title
Requires the office of temporary disability and assistance to conduct a homelessness study; requires a report by June 30, 2017.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1761 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4129A |
2016-01-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2015-05-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2015-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |