NY S04131 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.594
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.594
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits tenants or residents of limited profit housing, or persons acting on their behalf, to copy financial documents pertaining to their projects, subject to a reasonable charge therefor, the maximum of which shall be prescribed by regulation.
Title
Permits tenants or residents of limited profit housing, or persons acting on their behalf, to copy financial documents pertaining to their projects, subject to a reasonable charge therefor, the maximum of which shall be prescribed by regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.594 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.133 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | substituted for a5351 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.883 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05351 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.594