NY S04133 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the aggregate annual income of low income persons or families eligible for accommodations in a company project.
Title
Relates to the aggregate annual income of low income persons or families eligible for accommodations in a company project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.73 |
2019-12-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.726 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.85 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | substituted for a5350 |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-05-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.326 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05350 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.73