NY S04144 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - SIGNED CHAP.73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - SIGNED CHAP.73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that nursery growers and dealers registrations shall be valid for two years from the date of issuance.
Title
Provides that nursery growers and dealers registrations shall be valid for two years from the date of issuance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.73 |
2011-05-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2011-05-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2011-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.416 |
2011-05-25 | Assembly | substituted for a7429 |
2011-04-12 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2011-04-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-04-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-04-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.288 |
2011-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A07429 (Same As) 2011-05-25 - substituted by s4144