NY S04146 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - SIGNED CHAP.258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends, from December 31, 2013 to December 31, 2014, the expiration of the authorization granted to residential property owners in high risk brush fire areas on Staten Island to cut and remove reeds from their property.
Title
Extends, from December 31, 2013 to December 31, 2014, the expiration of the authorization granted to residential property owners in high risk brush fire areas on Staten Island to cut and remove reeds from their property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.258 |
2013-07-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.285 |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | substituted for a122 |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2013-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-04-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.332 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A00122 (Same As) 2013-05-20 - substituted by s4146