NY S04155 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - signed chap.319
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - signed chap.319
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the granting of letters of administration and letters of administration with will annexed.
Title
Relates to the granting of letters of administration and letters of administration with will annexed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Senate | signed chap.319 |
2019-10-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.432 |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4155 |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-04 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-02-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-01-31 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.17 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-11 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-05-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A795 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.432 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00795 (Same As) 2019-10-03 - signed chap.319