NY S04170 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes land banks to lend money, to make grants and take and hold real and personal property as security for the payment of funds so loaned or for the performance and enforcement of grant agreements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes land banks to lend money, to make grants and take and hold real and personal property as security for the payment of funds so loaned or for the performance and enforcement of grant agreements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.558
2019-03-04SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A01896 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - referred to local governments

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback