NY S04176 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.56
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - approval memo.56
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires supermarkets to make excess food available to qualifying entities.
Title
Requires supermarkets to make excess food available to qualifying entities.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Roxanne Persaud [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | approval memo.56 |
2020-12-23 | Senate | signed chap.352 |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.881 |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4176A |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-02-25 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-02-25 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.355 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | reported |
2020-01-08 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-29 | Senate | print number 4398a |
2019-05-29 | Senate | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-02-04 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4398A |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.881 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4176A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04398 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - approval memo.56