NY S04177 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the aggregate value realized from the sale of a controlled substance for the seller to be considered as operating as a major trafficker.
Title
Reduces the aggregate value realized from the sale of a controlled substance for the seller to be considered as operating as a major trafficker.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.355 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.950 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08283 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to codes