NY S04187 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7315
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7315
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the use of seatbelts by volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance service workers; provides exception for vehicles which do not have restraint systems provided by the manufacturer or to volunteer firefighters not seated within the confines of the vehicle or emergency medical personnel providing patient care in the rear compartment of an ambulance.
Title
Requires the use of seatbelts by volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance service workers; provides exception for vehicles which do not have restraint systems provided by the manufacturer or to volunteer firefighters not seated within the confines of the vehicle or emergency medical personnel providing patient care in the rear compartment of an ambulance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7315 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4187A |
2015-03-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-03-25 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.300 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07315 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - signed chap.448