NY S04188 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.268
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.268
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires financial institutions to notify a customer thirty days prior to charging a fee based on account inactivity; requires such notice to include a telephone number and the full contact information of a representative of the financial institution responsible for resolving any matter relating to the fee.
Title
Requires financial institutions to notify a customer thirty days prior to charging a fee based on account inactivity; requires such notice to include a telephone number and the full contact information of a representative of the financial institution responsible for resolving any matter relating to the fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 106 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.268 |
2020-10-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.442 |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | substituted for a9140 |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-02-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.178 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2019-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.899 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |