NY S04190 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to including the name and telephone number of the mortgage servicer for a plaintiff in a mortgage foreclosure action involving a one- to four-family residential property on certain documents pertaining to such action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to including the name and telephone number of the mortgage servicer for a plaintiff in a mortgage foreclosure action involving a one- to four-family residential property on certain documents pertaining to such action.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-11AssemblySIGNED CHAP.269
2020-10-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-07-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-07-21Assemblypassed assembly
2020-07-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.234
2020-07-21Assemblysubstituted for a6976
2020-07-21Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2020-07-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-07-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-02-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2020-02-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2020-02-11Senate1ST REPORT CAL.417
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-03-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.276
2019-03-04SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Same As/Similar To

A06976 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.269

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback