NY S04197 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - SIGNED CHAP.75
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the sale of bonds and notes of the city of New York, the issuance of bonds or notes with variable rates of interest, interest rate exchange agreements of the city of New York, the refunding of bonds, and the down payment for projects financed by bonds; amends the New York state financial emergency act for the city of New York; makes further amendments relating to the effectiveness thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the sale of bonds and notes of the city of New York, the issuance of bonds or notes with variable rates of interest, interest rate exchange agreements of the city of New York, the refunding of bonds, and the down payment for projects financed by bonds; amends the New York state financial emergency act for the city of New York; makes further amendments relating to the effectiveness thereof.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.75
2019-06-28SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.451
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a6293b
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-17AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenateREPASSED SENATE
2019-06-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 4197B
2019-06-14SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-14Senatereturned to senate
2019-06-14AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2019-05-30Assemblyreferred to cities
2019-05-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-21Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-20Senate1ST REPORT CAL.793
2019-04-01SenatePRINT NUMBER 4197A
2019-04-01SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2019-03-04SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A06293 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - substituted by s4197b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04197&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04197&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04197
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04197&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04197A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04197&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S04197B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4197#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4197#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S4197#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04197&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback