NY S04202 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-06 - SIGNED CHAP.146
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-06 - SIGNED CHAP.146
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the manufacture, transport, shipment or possession of an undetectable knife.
Title
Prohibits the manufacture, transport, shipment or possession of an undetectable knife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.146 |
2019-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.79 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a4816 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.810 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04816 (Same As) 2019-08-06 - SIGNED CHAP.146