NY S04206 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - approval memo.32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - approval memo.32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an affirmative defense for causes of actions related to damages for any claim on grounds that a party possessed or used seeds or plants that contained genetically engineered or genetically modified organisms without entering into an agreement or paying fees to the manufacturer or licensed distributor of such products.
Title
Establishes an affirmative defense for causes of actions related to damages for any claim on grounds that a party possessed or used seeds or plants that contained genetically engineered or genetically modified organisms without entering into an agreement or paying fees to the manufacturer or licensed distributor of such products.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | approval memo.32 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | signed chap.612 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.433 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4206A |
2019-05-07 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-07 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1104a |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-02-05 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-02-05 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-01-31 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.22 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-14 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-05-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1104A |
2019-05-06 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4206A |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.433 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01104 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - approval memo.32