NY S04227 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - referred to environmental conservation
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the use of moneys in the open space account of the environmental protection fund for the support of the Historic Hudson-Hoosic Rivers Partnership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the use of moneys in the open space account of the environmental protection fund for the support of the Historic Hudson-Hoosic Rivers Partnership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-17Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2014-06-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-05-19SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2014-05-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2014-05-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.726
2014-01-08SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2014-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2014-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2013-06-11Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2013-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2013-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2013-06-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2013-06-05Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2013-06-04Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1004
2013-03-15SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A06225 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback