NY S04227 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a tax exemption for U.S. military reservists and members of the National Guard.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides a tax exemption for U.S. military reservists and members of the National Guard.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-05-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-09Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-08Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1075
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2017-06-21SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.926
2017-02-06SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

Same As/Similar To

A05255 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to real property taxation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback