NY S04241 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.91
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes retail licensees to purchase beer, wine and liquor by means of a business payment card.
Title
Authorizes retail licensees to purchase beer, wine and liquor by means of a business payment card.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-27 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.91 |
2019-12-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.745 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.703 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a6701a |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2019-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4241A |
2019-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.411 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06701 (Same As) 2019-12-27 - APPROVAL MEMO.91