NY S04249 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibited locations for new retail electronic cigarette stores and tobacco businesses.
Title
Relates to prohibited locations for new retail electronic cigarette stores and tobacco businesses.
Sponsors
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4249A |
2019-05-31 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06842 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to health