NY S04253 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - PRINT NUMBER 4253B
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - PRINT NUMBER 4253B
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that it shall be unlawful for any person to organize, sponsor, conduct, promote, or participate in any contest, competition, tournament or derby where the objective of such contest or competition is to take wildlife.
Title
Provides that it shall be unlawful for any person to organize, sponsor, conduct, promote, or participate in any contest, competition, tournament or derby where the objective of such contest or competition is to take wildlife.
Sponsors
Sen. Monica Martinez [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4253B |
2020-01-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4253A |
2019-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00722 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
A09775 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - referred to environmental conservation
A09775 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - referred to environmental conservation