NY S04254 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes educational institutions to agree to pay for all or a portion of the salaries and compensation payable to municipal school resource officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes educational institutions to agree to pay for all or a portion of the salaries and compensation payable to municipal school resource officers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-30Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-29Senate1ST REPORT CAL.935
2019-03-05SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A06750 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback