NY S04255 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - signed chap.305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-02 - signed chap.305
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that moneys awarded as damages or obtained by judgment or settlement as a result of a cause of action commenced against officers or employees of the office of mental health shall not be considered assets for purposes of determining whether or not there exists an inability to pay for services; provides that such moneys shall not be seized, offset or otherwise attached for the purposes of paying fees for services rendered by the department of mental hygiene.
Title
Provides that moneys awarded as damages or obtained by judgment or settlement as a result of a cause of action commenced against officers or employees of the office of mental health shall not be considered assets for purposes of determining whether or not there exists an inability to pay for services; provides that such moneys shall not be seized, offset or otherwise attached for the purposes of paying fees for services rendered by the department of mental hygiene.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-02 | Senate | signed chap.305 |
2020-11-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.771 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4255 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.142 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.114 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | rules report cal.114 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-29 | Senate | referred to mental health |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3402 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.771 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A03402 (Same As) 2020-12-02 - signed chap.305