NY S04264 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the filing of petitions of designation or nomination in the county of Westchester.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the filing of petitions of designation or nomination in the county of Westchester.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-05-29Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-29Assemblyordered to third reading cal.370
2019-05-29Assemblysubstituted for a349a
2019-04-29Assemblyreferred to election law
2019-04-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-09Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-08Senate1ST REPORT CAL.373
2019-03-05SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A00349 (Same As) 2019-05-29 - substituted by s4264

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback