NY S04266 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-29 - PRINT NUMBER 4266B
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-29 - PRINT NUMBER 4266B
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring local building and planning regulations to accommodate the use of solar thermal, photovoltaics, wind, hydroelectric, geothermal electric, geothermal ground source heat, tidal energy, wave energy, ocean thermal, farm waste electric generating equipment, and fuel cells.
Title
Relates to requiring local building and planning regulations to accommodate the use of solar thermal, photovoltaics, wind, hydroelectric, geothermal electric, geothermal ground source heat, tidal energy, wave energy, ocean thermal, farm waste electric generating equipment, and fuel cells.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4266B |
2018-06-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-02-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4266A |
2018-02-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2017-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A00034 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - amended on third reading 34b