NY S04277 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health practitioners to discuss with patients the risks associated with certain pain medications before prescribing such medications; requires that for the first opioid analgesic prescription of a calendar year the prescribing physician shall counsel the patient on the risks of overdose.
Title
Requires health practitioners to discuss with patients the risks associated with certain pain medications before prescribing such medications; requires that for the first opioid analgesic prescription of a calendar year the prescribing physician shall counsel the patient on the risks of overdose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.538 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4277A |
2019-04-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2019-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07285 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to health