NY S04281 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.694
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.694
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the termination of a residential lease by a victim of domestic violence; further provides for the lease termination procedure; allows the tenants to pay rent, pro-rata, up to the lease termination date; imposes a civil penalty; makes related provisions.
Title
Provides for the termination of a residential lease by a victim of domestic violence; further provides for the lease termination procedure; allows the tenants to pay rent, pro-rata, up to the lease termination date; imposes a civil penalty; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.694 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1063 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4281A |
2019-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4267a |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-14 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.293 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-01 | Senate | referred to housing |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4267A |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4281A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1063 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A04267 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.694