NY S04284 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires cemetery corporations to post and provide customers with the New York state cemetery disclosure form.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires cemetery corporations to post and provide customers with the New York state cemetery disclosure form.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-21Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-20Senate1ST REPORT CAL.779
2019-05-10SenatePRINT NUMBER 4284A
2019-05-10SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
2019-03-06SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A03429 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - print number 3429a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback