NY S04292 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Sets limits on severance packages equal to three months salary for public at-will employees not subject to a collective bargaining agreement or union contract.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sets limits on severance packages equal to three months salary for public at-will employees not subject to a collective bargaining agreement or union contract.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-04Assemblyordered to third reading cal.489
2019-06-04Assemblysubstituted for a2480
2019-05-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-05-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-09Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-08Senate1ST REPORT CAL.369
2019-03-06SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A02480 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - substituted by s4292

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback