NY S04305 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-01 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs courts to exonerate bail and order recognizance when no grand jury action has occurred for 45 days from arraignment, unless the people show good cause otherwise.
Title
Directs courts to exonerate bail and order recognizance when no grand jury action has occurred for 45 days from arraignment, unless the people show good cause otherwise.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-01 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-02-24 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-02-23 | 1ST REPORT CAL.152 | |
2010-02-03 | PRINT NUMBER 4305A | |
2010-02-03 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2010-01-06 | returned to senate | |
2010-01-06 | died in assembly | |
2009-06-16 | ordered to third reading rules cal.317 | |
2009-06-16 | substituted for a5542 | |
2009-05-06 | referred to codes | |
2009-05-06 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-05-06 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-05-04 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-04-29 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-04-28 | 1ST REPORT CAL.227 | |
2009-04-21 | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A5542-A (Same As) 2009-06-16 - substituted by s4305