NY S04305 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-23 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes state chartered banking institutions to pledge investment grade corporate bonds to secure state and municipal deposits; also authorizes the pledging of municipal bonds having a maturity of more than 5 years.
Title
Authorizes state chartered banking institutions to pledge investment grade corporate bonds to secure state and municipal deposits; also authorizes the pledging of municipal bonds having a maturity of more than 5 years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2016-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.313 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2015-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1364 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A07096 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to banks