NY S04305 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all toll plazas contain at least one cash lane where electronic toll collection systems are installed.
Title
Requires all toll plazas contain at least one cash lane where electronic toll collection systems are installed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2017-05-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02999 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation