NY S04308 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.219
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.219
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to criminal justice faculty employed by a community college.
Title
Relates to criminal justice faculty employed by a community college.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.219 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.280 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7261a |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4308A |
2019-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.316 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07261 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.219