NY S04310 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the presence of epinephrine auto-injector devices on pre-school premises.
Title
Authorizes the presence of epinephrine auto-injector devices on pre-school premises.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.601 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4310A |
2020-03-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |