NY S04311 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the use of campaign funds to pay any settlement fees, fines or penalties for sexual harassment civil or criminal actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the use of campaign funds to pay any settlement fees, fines or penalties for sexual harassment civil or criminal actions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-04SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4311A
2019-05-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-08Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-07Senate1ST REPORT CAL.617
2019-03-07SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07834 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - print number 7834a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback