NY S04315 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - PRINT NUMBER 4315A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - PRINT NUMBER 4315A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a county board of supervisors to require that a ferry operating within such county transport without charge or fee of any kind, any soldier, sailor or marine in uniform during their term of enlistment in the service of the United States.
Title
Authorizes a county board of supervisors to require that a ferry operating within such county transport without charge or fee of any kind, any soldier, sailor or marine in uniform during their term of enlistment in the service of the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4315A |
2020-06-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06365 (Same As) 2020-07-16 - reported referred to rules