NY S04335 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to certain application and referral forms for health care plans by authorizing the commissioner and superintendent of financial services to adopt regulations for the renewal of credentialing and re-credentialing of newly licensed health care professionals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to certain application and referral forms for health care plans by authorizing the commissioner and superintendent of financial services to adopt regulations for the renewal of credentialing and re-credentialing of newly licensed health care professionals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.760
2019-03-07SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A03077 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback