NY S04336 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the location of presiding judge at arraignment, appearance proceedings and pursuant to a warrant.
Title
Relates to the location of presiding judge at arraignment, appearance proceedings and pursuant to a warrant.
Sponsors
Sen. Catharine Young [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-02-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.79 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2013-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1018 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A07073 (Same As) 2014-05-28 - held for consideration in judiciary