NY S04336 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.481
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.481
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the municipal volunteer fire department of the village of Fishkill to hold its annual meeting and election of company and chief officers in December of each year.
Title
Allows the municipal volunteer fire department of the village of Fishkill to hold its annual meeting and election of company and chief officers in December of each year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.481 |
2015-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.530 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a5366b |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4336A |
2015-05-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.832 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05366 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4336a