NY S04347 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.407
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.407
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts certain corporations from participating or intervening in any political campaign on behalf of or in opposition to any candidate for public office.
Title
Restricts certain corporations from participating or intervening in any political campaign on behalf of or in opposition to any candidate for public office.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. Zellnor Myrie [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] |
Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.407 |
2019-10-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.472 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a623 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.729 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
Same As/Similar To
A00623 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.407
S01933 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S01933 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN