NY S04357 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the fingerprinting and background checks of contracted service providers of student support services.
Title
Relates to the fingerprinting and background checks of contracted service providers of student support services.
Sponsors
Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] | Sen. George Amedore [R] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4357A |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-04-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A02719 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education