NY S04363 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to automated teller machine fee disclosure; eliminates provisions requiring an automated teller machine operator to post a sign that a fee is imposed for the use of such machine, as well as the amount of such fee.
Title
Relates to automated teller machine fee disclosure; eliminates provisions requiring an automated teller machine operator to post a sign that a fee is imposed for the use of such machine, as well as the amount of such fee.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Hugh Farley [R] | Sen. Terry Gipson [D] | Sen. Mark Grisanti [R] |
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Joseph Robach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-29 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6234 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.450 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A06234 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - signed chap.199