NY S04364 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of municipal obligations by the county of Erie.
Title
Relates to the sale of municipal obligations by the county of Erie.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-30 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.89 |
2013-06-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | home rule request |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.358 |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | substituted for a6354 |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-20 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2013-05-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.495 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A06354 (Same As) 2013-05-29 - substituted by s4364